EP2495118 - Vehicle air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ban, Takahisa c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 02 /
Murase, Masakazu c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | 03 /
Yokomachi, Naoya c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8671 / JP | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/36] | Application number, filing date | 12157669.8 | 01.03.2012 | [2012/36] | Priority number, date | JP20110045200 | 02.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011045200 | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2495118 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2495118 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
B60H1/00478 (EP,US);
B60H1/22 (KR);
B60H1/32 (KR);
F25B21/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klimaanlage für ein Fahrzeug | [2012/36] | English: | Vehicle air conditioner | [2012/36] | French: | Climatiseur d'air pour véhicule | [2012/36] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/36] | 16.04.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007033951 (GOENKA LAKHI N [US], et al); | [X]US2010155018 (GOENKA LAKHI NANDLAL [US], et al); | [AD]JP2010195287 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]US2010274396 (YANG JIHUI [CA], et al) | by applicant | JPS6435268 | JPH1035268 | JP2010195287 |