EP2460736 - Flexible package with opening feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, James, J. 4617 N. Haymeadow Avenue Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54913 / US | 02 /
Hannah, Deborah, S. 1421 N. Briarcliff Drive Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54915 / US | 03 /
Marnocha, James, R. 1242 E. Edgewood Drive Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54913 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
Clarke, James, J. 1749 N. Elinor Street Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54914 / US | ||
02 /
Hannah, Deborah, S. 1421 N. Briarcliff Drive Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54915 / US | |||
03 /
Marnocha, James, R. 1242 E. Edgewood Drive Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54913 / US | Representative(s) | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2016/09] |
Former [2012/23] | Mabey, Katherine Frances Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12157724.1 | 26.10.2006 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | US20050323628 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 323628 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460736 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2460736 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D33/28, B65D75/58 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
B65D75/5833 (EP,US);
B65D83/08 (KR);
B65D75/46 (EP,US);
B65D75/545 (EP,US);
B65D77/04 (EP,US);
Y10S206/812 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/09] |
Former [2012/23] | DE, GB | Title | German: | Flexible Verpackung mit Öffnungsmerkmal | [2012/23] | English: | Flexible package with opening feature | [2012/23] | French: | Paquet flexible doté d'un moyen d'ouverture | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 06.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06817424.2 / EP1971536 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060817424) is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3228584 (ASHTON GEORGE H) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 35; figures 1-16 *; | [I]US3738568 (RUDA R) [I] 1-15* column 5, line 22 - line 63; figures 3,7-11; claims 1,6,11 *; | [X]GB2310652 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1-4; claims 1,5,6 * |