Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9776143 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2015060372 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12158074 | 05.03.2012 | WO2013EP54263 | 04.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2822676 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2018 | B1 | EP2822676 | 14.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12158074 | 05.03.2012 | WO2013EP54263 | 04.03.2013 | EP13707013 | 04.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104271221B | Global Dossier | 01.09.2017 | B | CN104271221 | 07.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | EP12158074 | 05.03.2012 | WO2013EP54263 | 04.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013131848 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12158074 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2636442 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12158074 | 05.03.2012 |