EP2636442 - Low cut-off ultrafiltration membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16 220 10 Lund / SE | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Bernd Grosselfinger Strasse 2 72414 Rangendingen / DE | 02 /
Hornung, Markus Gomaringer Strasse 41 72147 Nehren / DE | 03 /
Geckeler, Johannes Semdachstrasse 3 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Perchenek, Nils Gambro Dialysatoren GmbH Legal and Intellectual Property Holger Crafoord-Strasse 26 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 12158074.0 | 05.03.2012 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636442 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/02, B01D71/68, B01D69/08 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D61/145 (EP,US);
B01D67/0095 (US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D69/0871 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ultrafiltrationsmembranen mit niedrigem Cut-off | [2013/37] | English: | Low cut-off ultrafiltration membranes | [2013/37] | French: | Membranes d'ultrafiltration à faible seuil de rétention | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004056459 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al); | [A]DE102004008220 (MEMBRANA GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2008046779 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al); | [X]EP2042230 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE]); | [A]EP2253371 (BRAUN B AVITUM AG [DE]) | by applicant | US4824568 | WO9602317 | US2003178368 | US2006096912 | EP1842581 |