10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
27.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
30.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
19.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.03.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
22.08.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.10.2013 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
17.08.2012 |
Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2012 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.06.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
11.05.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |