Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014064939 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009154205 | 29.06.2009 | US201314011941 | 28.08.2013 | US82552510 | 29.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2463406 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2017 | B1 | EP2463406 | 13.03.2013 | A3 | EP2463406 | 13.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009154205 | 29.06.2009 | EP10006717 | 29.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8801373 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2014 | B2 | US2011014035 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009154205 | 29.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5210984B | Global Dossier | 12.06.2013 | B2 | JP2011007153 | 13.01.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2009154205 | 29.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2270258 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2012 | B1 | EP2270258 | 16.03.2011 | A3 | EP2270258 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2009154205 | 29.06.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2270258 |