EP2497578 - Remediation of underwater fluid storage tanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geoprober Drilling Limited 34 Albyn Place Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB10 1FW / GB | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Geoprober Drilling Limited 7 Queens Gardens Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB15 4YD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bamford, Antony Stephen 80 Countesswells Road Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB15 7YL / GB | 02 /
Lilley, Vincent Van 13 Bayview Road Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB15 4EY / GB | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12158317.3 | 06.03.2012 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | GB20110003751 | 07.03.2011 Original published format: GB 201103751 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2497578 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2497578 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/093, B01F5/02, B05B3/02 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B08B9/0933 (EP);
B01F25/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sanierung von Unterwasserflüssigkeitsspeichertanks | [2012/37] | English: | Remediation of underwater fluid storage tanks | [2012/37] | French: | Restauration de réservoirs de stockage sous-marin de fluides | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/22] | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]WO2007130715 (SIERRA PROCESS SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [I] 1,4-10,12-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,11; | [IY]US2010154828 (GREEN TED JOSEPH [US]) [I] 1,10 * paragraph [0011] * * figure 6 * [Y] 11; | [YA]US5855742 (LUMBROSO DANIEL [FR], et al) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 35 - line 41 * * column 4, line 1 - line 6 * * figure 1 * [A] 9,10; | [YA]US6021793 (MOULDER JEFFREY ERNEST [US]) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 38 - line 46 * * figure 4 * [A] 10 | by applicant | WO2006010906 |