EP2517551 - Watering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | Tree grate with gutter and cleaning device for watering and seepage | ||
[2020/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MeierGuss Limburg GmbH Elzer Strasse 23-25 65556 Limburg / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/39] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Buchhold, Jürgen Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158383.5 | 07.03.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | DE20111002303 | 28.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011002303 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2517551 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2517551 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517551 | Date: | 23.09.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G25/06, A01G27/00, A01G29/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A01G25/06 (EP);
A01G27/006 (EP);
A01G29/00 (EP);
E01C11/227 (EP);
E01C9/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bewässerungssystem | [2020/22] | English: | Watering system | [2020/22] | French: | Système d'irrigation | [2020/22] |
Former [2012/44] | Baumrost mit Rinne und Reinigungseinrichtung für Bewässerung und Versickerung | ||
Former [2012/44] | Tree grate with gutter and cleaning device for watering and seepage | ||
Former [2012/44] | Grille de protection d'arbre à rainures et dispositif de nettoyage pour le drainage et l'infiltration | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2012 | AL | 23.09.2020 | CY | 23.09.2020 | CZ | 23.09.2020 | DK | 23.09.2020 | EE | 23.09.2020 | ES | 23.09.2020 | FI | 23.09.2020 | GR | 23.09.2020 | HR | 23.09.2020 | IT | 23.09.2020 | LT | 23.09.2020 | LV | 23.09.2020 | MC | 23.09.2020 | MK | 23.09.2020 | MT | 23.09.2020 | PL | 23.09.2020 | RO | 23.09.2020 | RS | 23.09.2020 | SI | 23.09.2020 | SK | 23.09.2020 | SM | 23.09.2020 | BG | 23.12.2020 | NO | 23.12.2020 | IS | 23.01.2021 | PT | 25.01.2021 | GB | 07.03.2021 | IE | 07.03.2021 | LU | 07.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | FR | 31.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.03.2012 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
GR | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
MK | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/36] | HU | 07.03.2012 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
GR | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 07.03.2012 | |
AL | 23.09.2020 | ||
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CY | 23.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
GB | 07.03.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
LU | 07.03.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
IE | 07.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
IT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
MC | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
DK | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SI | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SK | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 23.09.2020 | |
CZ | 23.09.2020 | ||
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
ES | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
PL | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
IS | 23.01.2021 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
SM | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 23.09.2020 | |
EE | 23.09.2020 | ||
FI | 23.09.2020 | ||
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RO | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
PT | 25.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LT | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
HR | 23.09.2020 | ||
LV | 23.09.2020 | ||
RS | 23.09.2020 | ||
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
BG | 23.12.2020 | ||
NO | 23.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 23.09.2020 | |
NO | 23.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0194963 (MENZEL HANS C [DE], et al) [A] 2,6 * figure - *; | [A]DE3701057 (MENZEL HANS C, et al) [A] 1-3,5,6,10 * column 5, line 13 - column 7, line 18; figure - *; | [A]GB2315396 (MILLS MOSES ARTHUR [GB], et al) [A] 2,3 * figure - *; | [A]US6453607 (DEWEY JON R [US]) [A] 2,3 * figure - *; | [A]DE202006010713U (KRONIMUS AG BETONSTEINWERKE [DE]) [A] 2,10* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1913810 (AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,8-10 |