EP2498130 - Curable composition for solid-state imaging device, and photosensitive layer, permanent pattern, wafer-level lens, solid-state imaging device and pattern forming method each using the composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shitabatake, Kouji c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158562.4 | 08.03.2012 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | JP20110050678 | 08.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011050678 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2498130 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2498130 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038, G02B3/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,KR);
B29D11/00307 (EP,KR);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08L79/08 (KR);
G02B1/04 (EP,KR);
G02B13/0085 (EP,KR);
G02B5/208 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0007 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/04, C08L77/00 (EP);
G02B1/04, C08L79/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Härtbare Zusammensetzung einer Feststoffzustand-Abbildungsvorrichtung, lichtempfindliche Schicht, permanentes Muster, Waferstufenlinse, Feststoffzustand-Abbildungsvorrichtung und musterformendes Verfahren, die jeweils die Zusammensetzung verwenden | [2012/37] | English: | Curable composition for solid-state imaging device, and photosensitive layer, permanent pattern, wafer-level lens, solid-state imaging device and pattern forming method each using the composition | [2012/37] | French: | Composition durcissable pour dispositif d'imagerie à semi-conducteurs, couche photosensible, motif permanent, lentille de niveau de tranche, dispositif d'imagerie à semi-conducteurs et procédé de formation de motifs utilisant la composition | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2006284947 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-3,10-17 * page 36, paragraph 174 * * page 41, paragraph 218 * * page 34, paragraph 179 - page 37, paragraph 197 * [I] 4-9; | [X]JP2007017458 (TAIYO INK MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-5,9-13,15-17 * page 12; examples 1-5; table 1 * * page 10, paragraph 39 - page 11 * * page 2, paragraph 1 *; | [X]WO2010038543 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10-13,17 * page 15, paragraph 53 *; | [T]EP2182396 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [T] 1-17* figure 4 *; | [X]JP2010237303 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1-3,5,10-13,17 * page 25, paragraph 129 - page 27, paragraph 134 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JP2010276825 (FUJIFILM CORP) [X] 1,4,5,7,10-13,17 * page 36, paragraph 189 * | by applicant | US161811 | US339049 | US410201 | US2833827 | JPS464605Y | JPS4836281 | US3905815 | US4069055 | US4069056 | JPS5437082 | DE2904626 | JPS5425957B | JPS5434327B | JPS5532070 | JPS5812577B | JPS5944615 | EP0104143 | JPS5953836 | JPS5971048 | US4508811 | JPS60239736 | JPS61166544 | JPS61169835 | JPS61169837 | JPS6258241 | JPS62143044 | JPS62150242 | DE3604580 | DE3604581 | EP0233567 | JPS62212401 | US4734444 | JPS6370243 | US4760013 | JPS63298339 | EP0297443 | EP0297442 | EP0370693 | JPH02150848 | US4933377 | EP0390214 | JPH02272009 | JPH02296514 | JPH03112992 | JPH03172301 | JPH04365049 | JPH059407 | US5227227 | EP0568993 | JPH06157623 | JPH06175564 | JPH06175561 | JPH06175554 | JPH06175553 | JPH06295060 | JPH06348011 | JPH07128785 | JPH07128867 | JPH07140589 | JPH07146562 | JPH0768256B | JPH07292014 | JPH07306527 | JPH07319161 | JPH08507960 | JPH08278637 | JPH0977994 | JPH09169821 | JPH09188685 | JPH09188686 | JPH09188710 | JP2764769B | JP2763775B | JPH10300922 | JPH10339949 | JPH11240930 | JPH11271969 | JP2000066385 | EP0993966 | JP2000131837 | JP2000232264 | JP2000273370 | JP2000310808 | JP2001125255 | JP2001132318 | JP2001318463 | JP2002107916 | EP1204000 | JP2002273191 | JP2003049110 | JP2003238837 | JP2003262958 | JP2003533455 | JP2004037986 | JP2004300204 | JP2006063550 | JP2006085140 | JP2006291191 | JP2007002101 | JP2007002102 | JP2007277514 | JP2007291523 | JP2008009426 | JP2008029901 | JP2008081732 | JP4096205B | JP2008250074 | JP2008257045 | JP2009052010 | JP2009099591 | JP2009158863 | JP2009194396 | JP2009203462 | JP2009205029 | JP2009258668 | JP2010106268 | JP2011050678 | - J.C.S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 1653 - 1660 | - J.C.S. PERKIN II, (1979), pages 156 - 162 | - JOURNAL OF PHOTOPOLVMER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1995), pages 202 - 232 | - S.I. SCHLESINGER, PHOTOGR. SCI. ENG., (1974), vol. 18, page 387 | - T.S. BAL ET AL., POLVMER, (1980), vol. 21, page 423 | - J.V. CRIVELLO ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1977), vol. 10, no. 6, page 1307 | - J.V. CRIVELLO ET AL., J. POLYMER SCI., POLYMER CHEM. ED., (1979), vol. 17, page 1047 | - C.S. WEN ET AL., TEH, PROC. CONF RAD. CURING ASIA, (198810), page 478 |