EP2462985 - Power supply for light-based dermatologic treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shaser, Inc. 130 New Boston Street Suite 201 Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Owens, William 8 Lomas Circle Framingham, MA Massachusetts MA 01701 / US | 02 /
Aaron, Arthur 68 Gray Street Arlington, MA Massachusetts MA 02476 / US | 03 /
Ely, Douglas 386 Great Pond Road North Andover, MA Massachusetts MA 01845 / US | 04 /
Yonjan, Bikram 72 Oxford Steet Unit 1B Somerville, MA Massachusetts MA 02143 / US | 05 /
Lazarev, Victor 7 Duby Drive Billerica, MA Massachusetts MA 01821 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Camenisch, Andrew Richard, et al HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Camenisch, Andrew Richard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds, Yorkshire LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12158651.5 | 14.10.2010 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20090252369P | 16.10.2009 Original published format: US 252369 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462985 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2462985 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06, A61B18/20, // A61B18/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
A61N5/0616 (EP,KR,US);
A61B18/203 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00747 (US);
A61B2018/00452 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00458 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/0047 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00476 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0072 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00726 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00761 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00767 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00892 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00928 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00988 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1226 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1807 (US);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61N2005/063 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/0644 (EP,KR,US);
A61N2005/0654 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | Netzteil für ein dermatologisches Behandlungsgerät auf Lichtbasis | [2012/24] | English: | Power supply for light-based dermatologic treatment device | [2012/24] | French: | Alimentation électrique pour dispositif de traitement dermatologique à base de lumière | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10774051.6 / EP2398557 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100774051) is 22.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.10.2010 | AL | 31.07.2013 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | HR | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | MK | 31.07.2013 | MT | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | SM | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | IE | 14.10.2013 | LU | 14.10.2013 | NO | 31.10.2013 | RS | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
MT | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
LU | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.10.2010 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
BG | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
LU | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
RS | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
MK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
SM | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
IE | 14.10.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
HR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
NO | 31.10.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 31.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3134953 (SCHMID GEB BUEHL ANNEMARIE [DE]) [Y] 5 * abstract *; | [Y]US2004054386 (MARTIN TODD [US], et al) [Y] 5 * sentence last, paragraph 56 *; | [A]WO2005030317 (CURELIGHT LTD [IL]) [A] 1-14 * page 13, line 8 - line 12 * * page 17, line 1 - line 24 *; | [IAY]US2005245997 (HOLJO ULF P [JP], et al) [I] 1,4,8-14 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0081] * [A] 2 [Y] 3,5-7; | [Y]US2007198004 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0106] *; | [Y]WO2008012519 (EN LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 3,6,7* page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 3 *; | [Y]US2008058783 (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0132] *; | [Y]WO2009053965 (RADIANCY INC [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0039] * * claim 14 *; | [Y]WO2009109885 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 5 * page 8, line 20 - line 30 * |