EP2497396 - Coffee machine and method for operating same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schultes, Bernhard Rupert Mayer Straße 3 63741 Aschaffenburg / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Stiel, Jürgen, et al Patentanwalt Stiel Geissleite 32 97289 Thüngen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Stiel, Jürgen, et al Patentanwalt Stiel Geissleite 32 97289 Thüngen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158686.1 | 08.03.2012 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | DE20111013422 | 09.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011013422 | [2012/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2497396 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2497396 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36, A47J31/54 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
A47J31/36 (EP);
A47J31/542 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Title | German: | Kaffeemaschine und Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Kaffeemaschine | [2012/37] | English: | Coffee machine and method for operating same | [2012/37] | French: | Machine à café et procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'une machine à café | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 02.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2012 | AL | 20.02.2013 | CY | 20.02.2013 | CZ | 20.02.2013 | DK | 20.02.2013 | EE | 20.02.2013 | FI | 20.02.2013 | HR | 20.02.2013 | LT | 20.02.2013 | LV | 20.02.2013 | MK | 20.02.2013 | MT | 20.02.2013 | NL | 20.02.2013 | PL | 20.02.2013 | RO | 20.02.2013 | RS | 20.02.2013 | SE | 20.02.2013 | SI | 20.02.2013 | SK | 20.02.2013 | SM | 20.02.2013 | TR | 20.02.2013 | LU | 08.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 20.05.2013 | NO | 20.05.2013 | GR | 21.05.2013 | ES | 31.05.2013 | IS | 20.06.2013 | PT | 20.06.2013 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LU | 08.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2013 | ||
CY | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
SM | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
MT | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 08.03.2012 | |
AL | 20.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AL | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
TR | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AL | 20.02.2013 | |
CZ | 20.02.2013 | ||
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.02.2013 | |
DK | 20.02.2013 | ||
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RO | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
SK | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 20.02.2013 | |
EE | 20.02.2013 | ||
FI | 20.02.2013 | ||
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
NL | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/43] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
RS | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
HR | 20.02.2013 | ||
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
PT | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
LV | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.02.2013 | |
LT | 20.02.2013 | ||
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
SI | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
GR | 21.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
PL | 20.02.2013 | ||
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
ES | 31.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
SE | 20.02.2013 | ||
BG | 20.05.2013 | ||
NO | 20.05.2013 | ||
IS | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.02.2013 | |
NO | 20.05.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE69122012T (ACORTO INC [US]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US4137833 (YELLOZ RONI P) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [AD]EP1986530 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1 * figure 2a *; | [A]WO9400045 (FAEMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * figure 8 *; | [A]DE2747990 (RANCILIO SAS) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US2006037481 | DE20013176U | EP1986530 | DE69122012T | US4137833 |