EP2570187 - System for automated generation and handling of liquid mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | For all designated states PZ Cormay S.A. Wiosenna 22 05-092 Lomianki / PL | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Churski, Krzysztof Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 02 /
Garstecki, Piotr Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Izydorzak, Marcin Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 04 /
Jakiela, Slawomir Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
Kaminski, Tomasz Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 06 /
Korczyk, Piotr Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | 07 /
Makulska, Sylwia Instytut Chemii Fizycznej Polskiej Akademii Nauk Kasprzaka 44/52 01-224 Warszawa / PL | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Sielewiesiuk, Jakub AOMB Polska Sp. z o.o. ul. Emilii Plater 53 21st floor 00-113 Warsaw / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Sielewiesiuk, Jakub AOMB Polska Sp. z o.o. Emilii Plater 53, 28th floor 00-113 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 12158774.5 | 21.01.2011 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | PL20100390251 | 24.01.2010 Original published format: PL 39025110 | PL20100390250 | 24.01.2010 Original published format: PL 39025010 | PL20110393619 | 11.01.2011 Original published format: PL 39361911 | [2013/12] | Previously filed application, date | WO2011PL50002 | 21.01.2011 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2570187 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2570187 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,US);
B01F25/4331 (EP,US);
B01F25/433 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US);
B01L3/502784 (EP,US);
B01L2200/028 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0816 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0867 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0487 (EP,US);
B01L2400/049 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0655 (EP,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | B01L3/00, B01F5/06, B01F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur automatischen Erzeugung und Handhabung von Flüssiggemischen | [2013/12] | English: | System for automated generation and handling of liquid mixtures | [2013/12] | French: | Système de génération et de manipulation automatiques de mélanges liquides | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 19.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 29.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11705053.4 / EP2451577 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110705053) is 19.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - K. CHURSKI, J. MICHALSKI, P. GARSTECKI, "Droplet on demand system utilizing a computer controlled microvalve integrated into a stiff polymeric microfluidic device", LAB ON A CHIP, internet, (20091201), vol. 2010, no. 10, pages 512 - 518, XP002637214 [X] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/B915155A |