Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7089110 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2006 | B2 | US2005033511 | 10.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | US93404704 | 03.09.2004 | US42694703 | 30.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6898516 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2005 | B2 | US2004030493 | 12.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | US42694603 | 30.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6904360 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2005 | B2 | US2004027258 | 12.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | US42694503 | 30.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6917878 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2005 | B2 | US2003229441 | 11.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | US42694703 | 30.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1502080 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2013 | B1 | EP1502080 | 02.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300344 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1502079 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300346 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1502078 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300345 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003224396 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300344 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003223091 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2003 | A8 | AU2003223091 | 17.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300346 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003223090 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300345 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2463627 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B1 | EP2463627 | 02.10.2013 | A3 | EP2463627 | 13.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | EP03720823 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2425555T | 16.10.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | IL0300344 | 29.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03093768 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03093767 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03093765 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2004 | A3 | WO03093765 | 13.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37701902 | 30.04.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1502080 |