EP2463627 - Navigation system using corridor maps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2017/15] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Telmap Ltd. 11 Bareket Street 46511 Herzlia / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pechatnikov, Michael 13 Mozes Street Tel-Aviv 67442 / IL | 02 /
Kupferman, Michael Menachem 25 Vingait Street 30900 Zichron Yaakov / IL | 03 /
Yadan, Omry 4/2 Ein Ofarim Street 80600 Mitzpe Ramon / IL | 04 /
Eckstein, Ilya 101/7 Mezada Street 77711 Ashdod / IL | 05 /
Fagin, Alexander 121b/3 Lublin Street 71471 Lod / IL | 06 /
Nissim, Oren Ha'Gefen Street P.O. box 228 Moshav Tzofi 43580 / IL | [2012/36] |
Former [2012/24] | 01 /
Pechatnikov, Michael 5 Haavoda Street 63821 Tel Aviv / IL | ||
02 /
Kupferman, Michael Menachem 25 Vingait Street 30900 Zichron Yaakov / IL | |||
03 /
Yadan, Omry 4/2 Ein Ofarim Street 80600 Mitzpe Ramon / IL | |||
04 /
Eckstein, Ilya 101/7 Mezada Street 77711 Ashdod / IL | |||
05 /
Fagin, Alexander 121b/3 Lublin Street 71471 Lod / IL | |||
06 /
Nissim, Oren 41 Moshe Dayan Street 43580 Raanana / IL | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2014/23] | Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield, S1 2JA / GB | ||
Former [2014/19] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/52] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12158871.9 | 29.04.2003 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20020377019P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 377019 P | [2012/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2463627 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2463627 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2463627 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/30, G01C21/36, G01C21/32, G01C21/26 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
G01C21/3682 (EP,US);
G01C21/3611 (EP,US);
G01C21/3667 (EP,US);
G01C21/3679 (EP,US);
G01C21/3889 (EP,US);
G01C21/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | G01C21/30, G01C21/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2012/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Navigationssystem, welches Korridorkarten verwendet | [2012/24] | English: | Navigation system using corridor maps | [2012/24] | French: | Système de navigation utilisant des cartes de couloirs | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/20] | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03720823.8 / EP1502080 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030720823) is 01.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2003 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.04.2003 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
NL | 19.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0875878 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,12* column 20, line 13 - line 48 *; | [XI]US6163749 (MCDONOUGH WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,12,15 * column 3, line 28 - line 30 * * column 4, line 28 - line 33 * * column 5, line 33 - line 60 * * column 6, line 19 - line 25 * * column 8, line 35 - line 40 * * column 14, line 63 - column 15, line 52 * * column 15, line 54 - line 58 * [I] 11,14 | by applicant | US643630 | US6038559 | US6107944 | WO0101370 | WO0127812 | US6233518 | US6282489 | US6320518 | US2001045949 | US6347278 | US6381535 | US6462676 | US6526284 | - BECKMANN ET AL., "The R*-Tree: An Efficient and Robust Access Method for Points and Rectangles", PROCEEDINGS OF ACM SIGMOD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MANAGEMENT OF DATA, (1990), pages 322 - 331 |