EP2512136 - Tiling in video encoding and decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-13 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-13 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | ||
Former [2012/42] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pandit, Purvin, Bibhas 23 Timberhill Dr. Franklin Park, New Jersey 08823 / US | 02 /
Yin, Peng 6 John Street Ithaca, Massachusetts NY14850 / US | 03 /
Tian, Dong 574 Burroughs Road Boxborough, Massachusetts 01719 / US | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Le Dantec, Claude, et al Technicolor 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2013/04] | Le Dantec, Claude, et al Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2012/42] | Rittner, Karsten, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159060.8 | 11.04.2008 | [2012/42] | Priority number, date | US20070923014P | 12.04.2007 Original published format: US 923014 P | US20070925400P | 20.04.2007 Original published format: US 925400 P | [2012/42] | Previously filed application, date | US20080474708 | 11.04.2008 | [2012/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512136 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512136 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N13/00, H04N19/46, H04N19/61, H04N19/597 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/46 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,BR,KR,RU,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/111 (US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N19/172 (BR,RU,US);
H04N19/174 (KR);
H04N19/182 (BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/42] | H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2012/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tiling in der Videokodierung und -Dekodierung | [2012/42] | English: | Tiling in video encoding and decoding | [2012/42] | French: | Mosaïque dans un codage et décodage vidéo | [2012/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2015 | 28.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08742812.4 / EP2137975 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080742812) is 02.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/39] | BG | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | EE | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 01.06.2016 | |
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | HR | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5193000 (LIPTON LENNY [US], et al); | [X]DE19619598 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM AG [DE]); | [I]US2005117637 (ROUTHIER NICHOLAS [CA], et al); | [X]EP1581003 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORP [GB]); |