EP2640017 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carmody, Michael, James c/o Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Extension: 75077 Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159099.6 | 12.03.2012 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2640017 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H04L51/18 (EP);
H04L51/58 (EP);
H04L51/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Nachrichten | [2013/38] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING MESSAGES | [2013/38] | French: | Dispositif de communication et procédé pour le traitement de messages | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 02.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011258264 (BREMNER RICHARD [AU], et al) [Y] 5,6,12,13* page 2, paragraph 18 - page 4, paragraph 36; figure 4 *; | [IY] - "Mark body-empty emails to speed email reading/writing", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20090122), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013129048 [I] 1,4,7,8,11,14,15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,9,10,12,13 | [Y] - "Method and System for deleting an email body if the subject includes ' |