EP2515184 - Electrophotographic image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1, Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [2018/19] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Junichi c/o Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha Intellectual Property Department 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8562 / JP | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Junichi c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA Intellectual Property Department 1-1-1, Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken, 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2018/19] |
Former [2012/43] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159215.8 | 13.03.2012 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | JP20110096552 | 22.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011096552 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515184 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2515184 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515184 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G03G21/18 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
G03G21/1853 (EP,US);
G03G21/1676 (US);
G03G15/087 (EP,US);
G03G21/1821 (US);
G03G21/1825 (US);
G03G2221/1684 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2012/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Elektrofotographische Bildgebungsvorrichtung | [2012/43] | English: | Electrophotographic image forming apparatus | [2012/43] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images électrophotographiques | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 15.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2012 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1837713 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [I] 1,2,10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0117]; figures 1-18 *; | [I]US2009003876 (MAESHIMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [I] 1,3,10-13* paragraphs [0065] , [0073] - [0075] - [0100] , [0101]; figures 3-8 *; | [I]US2010054797 (TAKEYAMA YOSHIFUMI [JP], et al) [I] 1,4 * paragraphs [0077] - [0090]; figures 5-12 * | by applicant | JP2002040905 |