EP2639656 - Control device for a diving watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graham S.A. Boulevard des Eplatures 38 2300 La Chaux de Fonds / CH | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robert, Christophe Chemin de Jolimont 10 2400 Le Locle / CH | 02 /
Bernard, Julien Rue de l'Eglise 6 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Honoré 1 Case postale 2510 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/01] | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Honoré 1 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2013/38] | Richard, François-Régis e-Patent S.A. Rue Saint-Honoré, 1 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 12159349.5 | 13.03.2012 | [2013/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2639656 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2639656 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/04, G04B37/10, G04B47/06 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
G04B37/106 (EP);
G04B37/049 (EP);
G04B47/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2013/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Betätigung einer Taucheruhr | [2013/38] | English: | Control device for a diving watch | [2013/38] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour montre de plongée | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   20.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2012 | AL | 01.01.2020 | AT | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | ES | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | IT | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | NL | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | IE | 13.03.2020 | LU | 13.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | NO | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.03.2012 | |
AT | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 01.01.2020 | |
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
IT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 13.03.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
LU | 13.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
ES | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
NL | 01.01.2020 | ||
NO | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0869412 (KELEK S A [CH]) [Y] 6-9 * the whole document *; | [XYI]EP1818734 (MONTRES JOURNE S A [CH]) [X] 1-4,10 * the whole document * [Y] 6-9 [I] 5; | [A]CH698943 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]) [A] 6-9* the whole document *; | [X]CH702803 (DEMONACO SAM ATEL [MC]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0036] * | by applicant | CH423638 | - DE C.-A. REYMONDIN ET AL., Théorie d'horlogerie, pages 232 - 233 |