EP2469077 - Wind turbine with a wind turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/26] | Rotor blade for a wind energy facility | ||
[2020/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Borsigstrasse 26 26607 Aurich / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Wobben Properties GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE | ||
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Wobben, Aloys Argestraße 19 26607 Aurich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wobben, Aloys Argestraße 19 26607 Aurich / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2012/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2020/22] |
Former [2012/26] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12159358.6 | 19.12.2003 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20031000284 | 02.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10300284 | DE20031003824 | 31.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10303824 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2469077 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2469077 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469077 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, B64C27/46 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
F03D1/0633 (EP,US);
F03D1/06 (KR);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F05B2240/301 (US);
F05B2240/302 (EP);
F05B2260/96 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2012/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | LT | 27.02.2015 | LV | 27.02.2015 | Title | German: | Windenergieanlage mit einem Rotorblatt | [2020/04] | English: | Wind turbine with a wind turbine blade | [2020/04] | French: | Éolienne avec pale de rotor | [2020/09] |
Former [2012/26] | Rotorblatt für eine Windenergieanlage | ||
Former [2012/26] | Rotor blade for a wind energy facility | ||
Former [2012/26] | Pale de rotor pour une éolienne | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03814464.8 / EP1583904 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030814464) is 18.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2003 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | AT | 19.12.2020 | IE | 19.12.2020 | LU | 19.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.12.2003 | |
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
AT | 19.12.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/52] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
LU | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IE | 19.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 27.05.2020 | |
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
SE | 27.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4324530 (FRADENBURGH EVAN A, et al); | [XDYI]DE19738278 (HAFNER FELIX [DE]); | [A]DE19963252 (SCHULZE LUTZ [DE]); | [Y]WO0248546 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al); | Examination | FR2292878 | DE2944718 | by applicant | DE4436197 | DE4440744 | DE19614420 | DE19738278 | DE19743694 |