EP2500600 - Torque fluctuation absorber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saeki, Tomohiro c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
Nakagaito, Satoshi c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Department 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
Hayasaka, Naoko c/o AISIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-1, Aioi-cho, 1-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-0027 / JP | 04 /
Tachiuchi, Naoki c/o AISIN ENGINEERING CO., LTD. 1-1, Aioi-cho, 1-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-0027 / JP | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 12159493.1 | 14.03.2012 | [2012/38] | Priority number, date | JP20110056701 | 15.03.2011 Original published format: JP 2011056701 | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2500600 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2500600 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/129, F16F15/139, F16D13/70, // F16F15/134, F16F1/32 | [2020/41] | CPC: |
F16F15/1395 (EP,US);
F16D13/70 (EP);
F16F1/32 (EP,US);
F16F15/1292 (EP);
F16F15/1297 (EP,US);
F16F15/134 (EP,US);
F16F15/1392 (US);
F16D2013/706 (EP);
F16D2300/22 (EP);
F16F2230/0058 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | F16F15/129, F16F1/32 | ||
Former IPC [2012/38] | F16F15/129 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2012/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmomentschwankungsaufnehmer | [2012/38] | English: | Torque fluctuation absorber | [2012/38] | French: | Absorbeur de fluctuation de couple | [2012/38] | Examination procedure | 14.03.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 02.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 10.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JP2000081064 (EXEDY CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * abstract * * figures 1-4,24,26-30,32,34 * [A] 3,5,10-12 [Y] 15 [I] 9; | [XAI]JPH09100874 (EXEDY CORP) [X] 1,4,6-8,10 * abstract * * figures 1,4,9,10,11 * [A] 2,3,5 [I] 9; | [X]WO03031840 (AUTMOTIVE PRODUCTS GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 3,4,5 * * page 6 - page 7 *; | [XA]DE10133049 (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6-10 * figures 2-9 * * column 1 - column 5 * [A] 3,5; | [XA]EP2233779 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 9 - column 17 * [A] 4,6-10; | [XY]DE4326501 (DAIKIN SEISAKUSHO OSAKA KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,11,12,14 * figures 1,10 * * column 6 * [Y] 13; | [Y]JP2006283942 (EXEDY CORP) [Y] 13 * abstract * * figures 1,2,5-7,9,10,12 *; | [X]US4220233 (BAN HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 1 *; | [YA]JPS51141751U (.) [Y] 15 * figures 1-4 * [A] 1-3,5,7-12,14; | [A]DE102008029642 (HAEUSSERMANN LAMELLEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH05141461 (UORUTAA EFU PUREBA) [A] 4,6 * figure 14 *; | [A]EP0240810 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) [A] 4,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE7729027U (HAEUSSERMANN LAMELLEN DR.-ING KURT HAEUSERMANN) [A] 4,6 * figures 2,3,4a,4b,5a,5b *; | [A]DE2325711 (DAIKIN MFG CO LTD) [A] 11-15 * figures 1-18 * | by applicant | JP2005127507 |