|
21.02.2022 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2022 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2022 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2021 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
63 |
|
29.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 12 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.05.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.04.2021 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.2021 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
02.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.03.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
17 |
|
11.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
22.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
45 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
27 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.2021 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
22.12.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
17.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2020 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2020 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.2019 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2019 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
21 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
47 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
28 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
21.08.2019 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
16.08.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
12.07.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.07.2016 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2016 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2016 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |