Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9688508 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2015075702 | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 | US201213420322 | 14.03.2012 | US201414552073 | 24.11.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012315569 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101562292B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | B1 | KR20120137302 | 20.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5656752B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2015 | B2 | JP2013000887 | 07.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102814974B | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B | CN102814974 | 12.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2532507 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2018 | B1 | EP2532507 | 13.07.2016 | A3 | EP2532507 | 12.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2011130626 | 10.06.2011 |