EP2532948 - Lamp device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Hiromichi c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 02 /
Takahara, Yuichiro c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 03 /
Matsushita, Hiroshi c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 04 /
Toda, Masahiro c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 05 /
Osawa, Shigeru c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 06 /
Matsuda, Ryotaro c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 07 /
Sasaki, Jun c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 08 /
Osada, Takeshi c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Sofia Ellinor Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 12160090.2 | 19.03.2012 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | JP20110130624 | 10.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011130624 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2532948 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2532948 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2532948 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/02, F21V29/00, F21V23/00, H05B37/00, // F21Y101/02 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21K9/20 (EP,US);
F21S8/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Title | German: | Lampenvorrichtung | [2012/50] | English: | Lamp device | [2012/50] | French: | Dispositif de lampe | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 27.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.03.2012 | AL | 04.06.2014 | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | RS | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.03.2012 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 19.03.2012 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006121602 (HOSHIZAKI JON A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0050] , [ 113] , [ 114] * * figures 4, 5 *; | [Y]WO2008024821 (BRILLIANT TELECOMMUNICATIONS I [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040] * * claims 1, 5, 6, 12, 31, 33 *; | [A]WO2010133993 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 9 - page 7, line 15 *; | [A]WO2010143797 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0120] *; | [Y]US2011006658 (CHAN WAI KWAN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 7 *; | [A]EP2287528 (YOUNG DONG TECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-6 * figures 2, 3 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 33] *; | [XP]EP2392903 (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [XP] 1* paragraph [0025] * |