EP2495308 - Improved production of glycoproteins using manganese [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2012/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crowell, Christopher K. 1836 Mallard Dr. Superior, CO 80027 / US | 02 /
Grampp, Gustavo 5363 Muirfield Ct. Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2012/36] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12160158.7 | 06.12.2006 | [2012/36] | Priority number, date | US20050748880P | 08.12.2005 Original published format: US 748880 P | [2012/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2495308 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/02, C07K14/505, C12P21/02, C12N5/10 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/505 (EP,US);
C07K14/575 (US);
C12N5/0018 (EP,US);
C12P21/005 (EP,US);
C12N2500/20 (EP,US);
C12N2500/32 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/36] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Herstellung von Glykoproteinen unter Verwendung von Mangan | [2012/36] | English: | Improved production of glycoproteins using manganese | [2012/36] | French: | Production améliorée de glycoprotéines au moyen de manganèse | [2012/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 15.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/36] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06847508.6 / EP1957630 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060847508) is 08.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9808934 (LIFE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 13 * claim 14 *; | [X]EP1085083 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 13,14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0029] *; | [X] - KAUFMAN RANDAL J ET AL, "Depletion of manganese within the secretory pathway inhibits O-linked glycosylation in mammalian cells", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 33, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 9813 - 9819, XP002454613 [X] 13-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00199a001 | [AD] - WITSELL D L ET AL, "DIVALENT CATION ACTIVATION OF GALACTOSYLTRANSFERASE IN NATIVE MAMMARY GOLGI VESICLES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 265, no. 26, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 15731 - 15737, XP002454614 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - CROWELL CHRISTOPHER K ET AL, "Amino acid and manganese supplementation modulates the glycosylation state of erythropoietin in a CHO culture system", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (200702), vol. 96, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 538 - 549, XP002454615 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21141 | by applicant | US4667016 | US4703008 | WO9105867 | WO9505465 | US5459031 | WO0024893 | WO0181405 | - KELLEHER; GILMORE, PNAS, (1997), vol. 94, no. 10, pages 4994 - 4999 | - KELLEHER ET AL., MOLECULAR CELL, (2003), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 101 - 111 | - KELLEHER ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 55 - 65 | - COUTO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, no. 1, pages 378 - 382 | - JENSEN; SCHUTZBACH, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1981), vol. 256, no. 24, pages 12899 - 12904 | - SHARMA ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 126, no. 2, pages 319 - 25 | - SUGIURA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, no. 16, pages 9501 - 9507 | - WITSELL ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, no. 26, pages 15731 - 7 | - KAUFRNAN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 33, pages 9813 - 9 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, no. 8, pages 3657 - 3663 | - ASHWELL; HARFORD, ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1982), vol. 51, no. 1, pages 531 - 554 | - GO6CHEE ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1347 - 55 | - DARLING ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, no. 49, pages 14524 - 31 | - ELLIOTT ET AL., EXP HEMATOL., (2004), vol. 32, no. 12, pages 1146 - 55 | - TAKEUCHI ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, no. 20, pages 7819 - 22 | - ZANETTE ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 275 - 287 | - COTES; BANGHAM, NATURE, (1961), vol. 191, page 1065 | - ELLIOTT ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, no. 37, pages 11237 - 45 | - ELLIOTT ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 33, no. 37, pages 11237 - 45 |