EP2468507 - Transfer device for foil exchange. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2012/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleil, Rainer Holunderweg 10 73116 Wäschenbeuren / DE | 02 /
Matthes, Uwe Hochalbstraße 1 72475 Bitz / DE | 03 /
Sonnenschein, Joachim Am Himmelsberg 3 64367 Mühltal / DE | 04 /
Weber, Alexander Ruländerweg 1 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2012/26] | Application number, filing date | 12160269.2 | 20.03.2008 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071015378 | 28.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015378 | [2012/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2468507 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2468507 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2468507 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F19/02 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B41F19/02 (EP);
B41F19/06 (EP);
B41F19/062 (EP);
B41P2219/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/26] | Title | German: | Übergabevorrichtung für Folienwechsel | [2012/26] | English: | Transfer device for foil exchange. | [2012/26] | French: | Dispositif de transmission pour un changement de film. | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 18.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08102791.4 / EP1974917 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2008 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9106689U (FRITZ LANGE METALLWARENFABRIK, 3257 SPRINGE, DE) [A] 1 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 7 *; | [A]DE102005043940 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0049]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE8233414U (M.A.N. ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG) [A] 1 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 13 *; | [A]GB627868 (ARMANDO REGGIANI) [A] 1 * page 2, line 5 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1177172 (FRANZ PRISTOU) [A] 1 * column 2, line 40 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]DE1194562 (RICHARD BILLHOEFER FA) [A] 1 * column 4, line 10 - line 20 * | by applicant | EP0578706 | DE102005043940 | DE9106689U |