EP2502681 - Device for investigating and cleaning tubes and lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riezler, Josef Industriestrasse 53 87448 Waltenhofen / DE | [2012/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann Schloss Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | [2015/34] |
Former [2012/39] | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann Schloss Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12160283.3 | 20.03.2012 | [2012/39] | Priority number, date | DE20112000650U | 22.03.2011 Original published format: DE 202011000650 U | [2012/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2502681 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2502681 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2502681 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/043, F16L25/00, F16L33/00, G03B37/00, B08B9/027, B08B9/04, B08B9/051 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
B08B9/0495 (EP);
B05B1/14 (EP);
B08B9/027 (EP);
B08B9/04 (EP);
B08B9/0433 (EP);
B08B9/051 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | B08B9/043, F16L25/00, F16L33/00, G03B37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] |
Former [2012/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 01.10.2013 | ME | 01.10.2013 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Untersuchen und Reinigen von Rohren und Leitungen | [2012/39] | English: | Device for investigating and cleaning tubes and lines | [2012/39] | French: | Dispositif d'examen et de nettoyage de tuyaux et conduites | [2012/39] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2012 | AL | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | RS | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | GB | 20.03.2016 | IE | 20.03.2016 | LU | 20.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | FR | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
FR | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/08] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 20.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | DK | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | DK | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05331905 (KYOKUTO KAIHATSU KOGYO CO) [X] 1,5,7-9,11-15 * abstract * [I] 10; | [X]DE19607913 (HOERGER KURT [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-18* the whole document *; | [XI]JPH11114513 (KANTOOL KK, et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * abstract * [I] 10; | [XI]DE10255221 (RIEZLER PASCAL [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,8,11-17 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [XI]US2005045751 (NANCE THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * figure - * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 10; | [XI]WO2006127095 (STONEMAN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-15,18 * the whole document * [I] 10 |