EP2518077 - Method of producing 4-demethoxydaunorubicin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synbias Pharma AG Pestalozzistrasse 2 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2015/50] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Synbias Pharma Ltd. Krepilshchikov Str. 181 83085 Donetsk / UA | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Synbias Pharma Ltd. Krepilshchikov Str. 181 83085 Donetsk / UA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zabudkin, Alexander Universitetskaja Str. 27, Fl. 26 83055 Donetsk / UA | 02 /
Matvienko, Victor Panfilova 20, Fl. 37 83114 Donetsk / UA | 03 /
Matvyeyev, Alexey Panfilova 20, Fl. 30 83114 Donetsk / UA | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Danner, Stefan, et al LifeTech IP Spies Danner & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elsenheimerstrasse 47a 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | Danner, Stefan, et al ZSP Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | Danner, Stefan, et al DR. VOLKER VOSSIUS Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft Geibelstraße 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12160375.7 | 20.03.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US201113097131 | 29.04.2011 Original published format: US201113097131 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518077 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518077 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/252 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07H15/252 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 4-Demethoxy-Daunorubicin | [2012/44] | English: | Method of producing 4-demethoxydaunorubicin | [2012/44] | French: | Procédé de production de 4-déméthoxydaunorubicine | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 15.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.11.2013 | Stay of proceedings | [2014/01] | 26.11.2013 | Stay of proceedings | [2015/33] | 02.11.2015 | Resumption of proceedings | [2015/33] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2012 | AL | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | GR | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IS | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PT | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | IE | 20.03.2016 | LU | 20.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
BG | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PT | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PT | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
LU | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.03.2012 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 20.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 06.01.2016 | |
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IS | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | IS | 06.01.2016 | |
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US7053191 (ZABUDKIN ALEXANDER F [UA], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007135624 (ZABUDKIN ALEXANDER F [UA], et al) [A] 11-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]US4188377 (ARCAMONE FEDERICO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4085548 | EP0328399 | US5587495 | US5218130 | US5103029 | US7053191 | US4188377 |