EP2505521 - Transport device for powdery and/or granulated material as well as mixtures of this material with liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/22] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ungerechts, Herbert Hoefnagelsdyk 1 47647 Kerken / DE | 02 /
Frank, Hans-Jörg Raedtstr. 12 47918 Tönisvorst / DE | 03 /
Hagedorn, Markus Erlenweg 99 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | BIP Patents Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2013/15] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/40] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 12160905.1 | 23.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | EP20110160515 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: EP 11160515 | [2012/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2505521 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2505521 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G11/12, B65G11/18, B65G69/18 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
B65B1/32 (US);
B65G11/126 (EP,US);
B65G11/186 (EP,US);
B65G69/181 (EP,US);
B65B2210/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Title | German: | Fördereinrichtung für pulverförmiges und/oder granuliertes Gut sowie Gemische dieses Gutes mit Flüssigkeiten | [2012/40] | English: | Transport device for powdery and/or granulated material as well as mixtures of this material with liquids | [2012/40] | French: | Dispositif de transport pour matériau pulvérulent et/ou granulaire ainsi que des mélanges de ce matériau avec des liquides | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2012 | AL | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | RS | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | IE | 23.03.2015 | LU | 23.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | PT | 07.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
NO | 07.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1475348 (HAVER & BOECKER [DE]) [A] 1,4,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2070850 (BRUNONE RENE [FR]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 14; figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE202005016035U (ALFRED BOLZ GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5881780 (MATYE REINHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,2,10-12 * column 4, line 57 - column 6, line 56; figure - *; | [A]US4125195 (SASADI JOHN) [A] 1,12 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE19527240 |