EP2506209 - Utility meter display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanley, James Patrick 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
Crittenden, Curtis Whitmore 130 Main Street Somersworth, NH New Hampshire 03878 / US | [2012/40] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12161015.8 | 23.03.2012 | [2012/40] | Priority number, date | US201113075482 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: US201113075482 | [2012/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2506209 | Date: | 03.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/06 | [2012/40] | CPC: |
G06Q50/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigesystem für einen Versorgungszähler | [2012/40] | English: | Utility meter display system | [2012/40] | French: | Système d'affichage de compteur utilitaire | [2012/40] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/20] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006044035 (ECHELON CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * figures 2-4,20 * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] *; | [A]CN201130214Y (SHENZHEN HND METERS CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-4 * * claim 1 * |