EP2641653 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLVENT RESISTANT POLYMERIC MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/39] | Solvent resistant polymeric membranes | ||
[2020/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT NV Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven KU Leuven Research & Development Waaistraat 6, Bus 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [2021/12] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven Waalstraat 6 box 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Struzynska-Piron, Izabela AGFA-GEVAERT, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Vankelecom, Ivo AGFA-GEVAERT, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Vanmaele, Luc AGFA-GEVAERT, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Loccufier, Johan AGFA-GEVAERT, IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Viaene, Kris AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 12161017.4 | 23.03.2012 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641653 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2641653 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/12, B01D67/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B01D67/0011 (EP,US);
C09D4/06 (US);
B01D53/228 (EP,US);
B01D67/00091 (EP,US);
B01D67/009 (US);
B01D67/0093 (EP,US);
B01D69/06 (EP,US);
B01D69/125 (EP,US);
B01D71/5222 (EP,US);
B01D71/64 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/82 (EP,US);
C08F283/00 (US);
C08F283/04 (US);
C09D133/14 (US);
C09D181/06 (US);
B01D2323/30 (EP,US);
B01D2323/34 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] |
Former [2013/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON LÖSUNGSMITTELBESTÄNDIGEN POLYMERMEMBRANEN | [2020/52] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLVENT RESISTANT POLYMERIC MEMBRANES | [2020/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MEMBRANES POLYMÈRES RÉSISTANT AUX SOLVANTS | [2020/52] |
Former [2013/39] | Lösungsmittelbeständige Polymermembranen | ||
Former [2013/39] | Solvent resistant polymeric membranes | ||
Former [2013/39] | Membranes polymères résistant aux solvants | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/16] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 05.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.10.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2012 | AL | 12.05.2021 | AT | 12.05.2021 | CY | 12.05.2021 | CZ | 12.05.2021 | DK | 12.05.2021 | EE | 12.05.2021 | ES | 12.05.2021 | FI | 12.05.2021 | HR | 12.05.2021 | IT | 12.05.2021 | LT | 12.05.2021 | LV | 12.05.2021 | MC | 12.05.2021 | MK | 12.05.2021 | MT | 12.05.2021 | NL | 12.05.2021 | PL | 12.05.2021 | RO | 12.05.2021 | RS | 12.05.2021 | SE | 12.05.2021 | SI | 12.05.2021 | SK | 12.05.2021 | SM | 12.05.2021 | TR | 12.05.2021 | BG | 12.08.2021 | NO | 12.08.2021 | GR | 13.08.2021 | IS | 12.09.2021 | PT | 13.09.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
TR | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
MK | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CY | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 23.03.2012 | |
AL | 12.05.2021 | ||
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
MC | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
IT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SI | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 12.05.2021 | |
AT | 12.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
EE | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RO | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SK | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
CZ | 12.05.2021 | ||
DK | 12.05.2021 | ||
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
SM | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
NL | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
PL | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
ES | 12.05.2021 | ||
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
RS | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
IS | 12.09.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
PT | 13.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
HR | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
LV | 12.05.2021 | ||
SE | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
NO | 12.08.2021 | ||
GR | 13.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | ||
BG | 12.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 12.05.2021 | |
FI | 12.05.2021 | ||
LT | 12.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4931182 (BURGOYNE JR WILLIAM F [US], et al); | [XD]US5079272 (ALLEGREZZA JR ANTHONY E [US], et al); | [X]EP0803533 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al); | [X]WO0069549 (PALL CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2007056901 (WANG HUA [US], et al); | [AD]WO2010111755 (UNIV LEUVEN KATH [BE], et al) | Examination | WO2008143514 | US2011120940 | by applicant | EP0012557 | US5079272 | US5468390 | US5885456 | US6045899 | EP0997182 | EP1007195 | US2002161066 | US2003209487 | US2005139545 | EP1609522 | EP1634610 | US2006076288 | US2006228483 | EP1733784 | WO2007125367 | WO2008138078 | US2010181253 | WO2010111755 |