EP2476415 - Treating bone-related disorders with selective androgen receptor modulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Tennessee Research Foundation UT Conference Center Suite 211 600 Henley Street Knoxville, TN 37996-4122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | For all designated states University of Tennessee Research Foundation UT Conference Center Suite 211 600 Henley Street Knoxville, TN 37996-4122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dalton, James 9896 Rue Bienville Place Lakeland TN 38002 / US | 02 /
Miller, Duane D. 8706 Maple Creek Cove Germantown, TN 38139 / US | 03 /
Steiner, Mitchell S. 8894 Silver Bark Drive Germantown, TN 38138 / US | 04 /
Veverka, Karen A. 669 Featherwind Cove, S. Cordova, TN 38018 / US | 05 /
Kearby, Jeffrey 1835 Galleon Blvd. Hilliard, OH 43024 / US | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2012/29] | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12161224.6 | 12.10.2004 | [2012/29] | Priority number, date | US20030510138P | 14.10.2003 Original published format: US 510138 P | US20040613206P | 28.09.2004 Original published format: US 613206 P | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2476415 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2476415 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/167, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P3/00, A61P5/00, A61K31/00, A61K31/165, A61K31/21, A61K31/32, A61K31/405, A61K31/4704, A61K31/66 | [2012/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/21 (EP,US);
A61K31/32 (EP,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/4704 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | AL | 26.03.2012 | HR | 26.03.2012 | LT | 26.03.2012 | LV | 26.03.2012 | MK | 26.03.2012 | Title | German: | Behandlung von Knochenerkrankungen mit selektiven androgenen Rezeptormodulatoren | [2012/29] | English: | Treating bone-related disorders with selective androgen receptor modulators | [2012/29] | French: | Traitement des troubles osseux avec des modulateurs sélectifs de récepteurs d'androgène | [2012/29] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/38] | 18.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04809913.9 / EP1673376 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2004034978 (GTX INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * pages 56-58; example 2 * * figure - ** claims 52-61,73-82 *; | [XP]WO2004064747 (GTX INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-7 * figures 4-5; examples 3 p 59-64; claim - * | by applicant | - WAHNER H W ET AL., Nuclear Medicine: ''Quantitative Procedures, TORONTO LITTLE, BROWN & CO., (1983), pages 107 - 132 | - "Assessment of Bone Mineral Part I", J NUCL MEDICINE, (1984), pages 1134 - 1141 | - "Bone Mineral Density of The Radius", J NUCL MEDICINE, (1985), vol. 26, pages 13 - 39 | - KALU DN, BONE MINER, (1991), vol. 15, pages 175 - 91 | - FAULKNER KG ET AL., AM J ROENTGENOLOGY, (1991), vol. 157, pages 1229 - 1237 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - TREAT ET AL., Liposomes in the Therapy of Infectious Disease and Cancer, LISS, (1989), pages 353 - 365 | - LIPOSOMES IN THE THERAPY OF INFECTIOUS DISEASE AND CANCER, pages 317 - 327 | - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 |