EP2560046 - Focus regulating apparatus of projector and projector using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Joon-young Jinheung Apt. 21-407, Manan-gu Anyany-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lim, Jae-geun Dugyeonmaeul Hyundai Apt. 342-304, Jeongja 2-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Jun-seok Cheongmyeongmaeul Byeoksan Apt. 336-1005, Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Misselbrook, Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2013/08] | Application number, filing date | 12161323.6 | 26.03.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | KR20110081495 | 17.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110081495 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2560046 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2560046 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G03B3/00, H04N9/31, G03B21/14 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
G03B3/00 (EP,US);
G02B7/28 (KR);
G03B21/14 (KR);
G03B21/142 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | G03B3/00, H04N9/31 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fokusregulerende Vorrichtung für Projektoren und Projektor damit | [2013/08] | English: | Focus regulating apparatus of projector and projector using the same | [2013/08] | French: | Appareil de réglage de mise au point de projecteur et projecteur l'utilisant | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 20.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006066822 (SALVATORI PHILLIP H [US], et al) [Y] 1,6 * paragraphs [0018] , [0026] , [0029] - [0035]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2006164610 (YOSHIKAWA TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1-6* paragraphs [0053] , [0057] , [0058]; figures 2,4,8,9 *; | [Y]US2007064205 (MENG CHI-YU [TW], et al) [Y] 1,6 * paragraphs [0028] - [0033]; figures 3-6 * |