EP2523452 - Image processing apparatus, image pickup apparatus, image processing method, and program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaizu, Shun c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Mitsunaga, Tomoo c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
Saito, Yasushi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
Kasai, Masanori c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Ealey, Douglas Ralph D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12161330.1 | 26.03.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | JP20110108047 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: JP 2011108047 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523452 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/235, H04N5/355 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
H04N23/741 (EP,US);
H04N23/73 (US);
H04N25/583 (EP,US);
H04N25/589 (EP,US);
H04N25/59 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Bildaufnahmevorrichtung, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Programm | [2012/46] | English: | Image processing apparatus, image pickup apparatus, image processing method, and program | [2012/46] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images, procédé de capture d'images, procédé de traitement d'images et programme | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/46] | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005045980 (GUIDASH ROBERT M [US]); | [A]US2005140804 (ADAMS JAMES E JR [US], et al); | [A]EP1689164 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]); | [A]US2007285526 (MANN RICHARD A [US], et al); | [XY]US2009091645 (TRIMECHE MEJDI [FI], et al); | [Y]US2010053346 (MITSUNAGA TOMOO [JP]); | [XY]US2010309333 (SMITH SCOTT [US], et al); | [A]US2011063483 (ROSSI GIUSEPPE [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH02174470 | JPH0795481 | JPH1175118 | JP2006253876 | JP4689620B |