EP2508092 - Foot balance device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rapha Shoes International Co., Ltd. 2F-13, No. 21, Lane 8, Tianmu E. Rd. Taipei City 11153 / TW | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tzeng, Tzann-Yuh c/o Alfred Lei Suite 152, 23 King St. Cambridge, CB1 1AH / GB | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 221443 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/41] | Horak, Michael Horak Rechtsanwälte Georgstrasse 48 30159 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161656.9 | 28.03.2012 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | TW20110111037 | 30.03.2011 Original published format: TW 100111037 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2508092 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2508092 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/14, A43B1/00, A43B13/38, A43B19/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
A43B7/1405 (EP);
A43B1/0081 (EP);
A43B13/38 (EP);
A43B19/005 (EP);
A43B7/142 (EP);
A43B7/143 (EP);
A43B7/1464 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/41] | A43B7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fußausgleichsvorrichtung | [2012/41] | English: | Foot balance device | [2012/41] | French: | Dispositif d'équilibrage de pied | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9852435 (MCROSKEY GUY [US]) [X] 1-13 * pages 10-14; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP2298102 (ISEPPI MARIO [CH], et al) [X] 1-12 * columns 4-7; figure - *; | [X]WO2006108660 (KRAUSS AXEL [DE]) [X] 1-12 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2006265904 (FUJITA MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]US4316333 (ROTHSCHILD HARVEY) [X] 1-13 * columns 3-4; figure - *; | [X]JP2003135557 (TAKAGI KAZUO) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]EP0630593 (SCHNEWLIN MAIER MARGARETA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 3; figure - * |