EP2518694 - Method for adjusting a CAD model of a pipe layout to a real-world environment in a submarine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Marine Systems GmbH Werftstraße 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE | [2019/39] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Marine Systems GmbH Werftstrasse 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Howaldtswerke-Deutsche Werft GmbH Werftstrasse 112-114 24143 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staack, Ingo Lünningsredder 30 24217 Schönberg / DE | 02 /
Riedel, Michael Stoltenrieden 20 b 23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | 03 /
Schuchardt, Rüdiger Preetzer Str. 10 24223 Schwentinental / DE | 04 /
Rieß, Patrick Pruthstraße 1 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Wuest, Harald Goethestr. 24A 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
Staack, Ingo Lünningsredder 30 24217 Schönberg / DE | ||
02 /
Riedel, Michael Stoltenrieden 20 b 23843 Bad Oldesloe / DE | |||
03 /
Schuchardt, Rüdiger Prettzer Str. 10 24223 Schwentinental / DE | |||
04 /
Rieß, Patrick Saalbaustraße 35 64283 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
Dr. Wülst, Harald Weckestr. 22 64289 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2020/01] |
Former [2012/44] | Patentanwälte Vollmann & Hemmer Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 12161789.8 | 28.03.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | DE201110100134 | 30.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011100134 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518694 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518694 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06T19/20, G06T19/00 | [2019/28] | CPC: |
G06T19/006 (EP);
G06F30/15 (EP);
G06T19/20 (EP);
G06F2113/14 (EP);
G06T2219/2021 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2019/02] | G06T19/20, G06T19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/44] | G06T19/00, G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anpassung eines CAD-Models eines Rohrverlaufs an eine reale Umgebung in einem Unterseeboot | [2012/44] | English: | Method for adjusting a CAD model of a pipe layout to a real-world environment in a submarine | [2012/44] | French: | Procédé d'adaptation d'un modèle CAD d'une trajectoire de tube à un environnement réel dans un submersible | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 17.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.10.2019 | 28.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2012 | AL | 01.01.2020 | CY | 01.01.2020 | CZ | 01.01.2020 | DK | 01.01.2020 | EE | 01.01.2020 | FI | 01.01.2020 | HR | 01.01.2020 | LT | 01.01.2020 | LV | 01.01.2020 | MC | 01.01.2020 | MK | 01.01.2020 | MT | 01.01.2020 | PL | 01.01.2020 | RO | 01.01.2020 | RS | 01.01.2020 | SE | 01.01.2020 | SI | 01.01.2020 | SK | 01.01.2020 | SM | 01.01.2020 | TR | 01.01.2020 | AT | 28.03.2020 | IE | 28.03.2020 | LU | 28.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | BG | 01.04.2020 | GR | 02.04.2020 | IS | 01.05.2020 | PT | 27.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
AL | 01.01.2020 | ||
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 28.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.03.2012 | |
CY | 01.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2020 | ||
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
MT | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 28.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
TR | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 28.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
AT | 28.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
PL | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SI | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
IE | 28.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
LU | 28.03.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
EE | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
MC | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SK | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RO | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
SM | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
DK | 01.01.2020 | ||
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
IS | 01.05.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
BG | 01.04.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
GR | 02.04.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
HR | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
LV | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
SE | 01.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | ||
RS | 01.01.2020 | ||
PT | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 01.01.2020 | |
FI | 01.01.2020 | ||
LT | 01.01.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102008043445 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [I] - GAUSEMEIER J ET AL, "AR-PLANNING TOOL - DESIGNING FLEXIBLE MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS WITH AUGMENTED REALITY", PROCEEDINGS VIRUAL ENVIRONMENTS 2002. ACM SIGGRAPH/EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS. BARCELONA, SPAIN, MAY 30 - 31, 2002; [EUROGRAPHICS WORKSHOP ON VIRTUAL ENVIRONMENTS], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (20020530), ISBN 978-1-58113-535-0, pages 19 - 25, XP001233143 [I] 1-7 * page 21 - page 24; figure 8 * | [A] - ISHII HIROTAKE, OSHITA SATOSHI, YAN WEIDA, SHIMODA HIROSHI, IZUMI MASANORI, "Development and evaluation of a dismantling planning support system based on augmented reality technology", International Journal of NUCLEAR SAFETY AND SIMULATION (IJNS), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 2185-3495, (201103), pages 52 - 60, URL: http://www.ijnsweb.com/?type=subscriber&action=articleinfo&id=55, (20120817), XP002681984 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - GEORGELI P ET AL, "An Industrial Augmented Reality Solution For Discrepancy Check", MIXED AND AUGMENTED REALITY, 2007. ISMAR 2007. 6TH IEEE AND ACM INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071113), ISBN 978-1-4244-1749-0, pages 111 - 115, XP031269883 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHOENFELDER R ET AL, "Augmented Reality for Industrial Building Acceptance", VIRTUAL REALITY CONFERENCE, 2008. VR '08. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080308), ISBN 978-1-4244-1971-5, pages 83 - 90, XP031340003 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - DUNSTON P S ET AL, "VIRTUAL VISUALIZATION FOR THE MECHANICAL TRADE", NAT. TAIWAN UNIV.. TAIPEI, TAIWAN, (2000), pages 1 - 6, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 17TH IAARC/CIB/IEEE/IFR INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AUTOMATION AND ROBOTICS IN CONSTRUCTION. 17TH ISAREC 2000, URL: http://www.iaarc.org/publications/fulltext/isarc2000-089_WD2.pdf, (20120517), XP002681985 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - Whitaker R. T. ET AL, "Object Calibration forAugmented Reality (Technical report ECRC-95-04)", (1995), pages Frontpg. - 17, European Computer-Industry Research Centre, URL: http://reference.kfupm.edu.sa/content/o/b/object_calibration_for_augmented_reality_1157075.pdf, (20120817), XP002681986 [A] 1,5 * pages 2, 4 - page 13 * | Examination | DE10134176 | - "7.1 AR im Service für Kraftwerks und Prozessanlagen", Wolfgang Friedrich (Hrsg.), ARVIKA: Augmented Reality für EntwicklungProduktion und Service, Deutschland, Publicis KommunikationsAgentur GmbH, GWA, Erlangen, (2004), pages 195 - 203 | - PHAN V T ET AL, "Using AR for real-time crosscheck of ventilator ducts at worksite", PROCEEDINGS - VRCAI 2010, ACM SIGGRAPH CONFERENCE ON VIRTUAL-REALITY CONTINUUM AND ITS APPLICATION TO INDUSTRY - PROCEEDINGS - VRCAI 2010, ACM SIGGRAPH CONFERENCE ON VIRTUAL-REALITY CONTINUUM AND ITS APPLICATION TO INDUSTRY 2010 ASSOCIATION FOR COMPU, (2010), doi:10.1145/1900179.1900241, pages 293 - 298 |