EP2560360 - Image forming apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ho-keun 213-1902, Tapsilmaeul DaeJu Fiore 2 danji Apt. Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu-gu, Tongin-si Gyeonggi-do Korea / KR | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Misselbrook, Paul Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2013/08] | Application number, filing date | 12162078.5 | 29.03.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | KR20110082460 | 18.08.2011 Original published format: KR 20110082460 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560360 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/40 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
G06V30/268 (EP,US);
H04N1/00 (KR);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2013/08] | English: | Image forming apparatus and control method thereof | [2013/08] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images et son procédé de commande | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08272789 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US2006217958 (TAGAWA MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [X]US2006245005 (HALL JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 6 * |