EP2523068 - Power saving method and apparatus thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2020 [2020/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synology Incorporated 3F-3, No. 106, Chang An W. Rd. Taipei 103 / TW | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Hsuan-Ting 13F.-3, No.168, Sec. 1, Wuquan W. Rd., West Dist. 403 Taichung City / TW | 02 /
Peng, Yi-Kai No.31, Aly. 28, Ln. 75, Jianguo Rd., Hualien City 970 Hualien County / TW | 03 /
Chen, Kuei-Huan 11F., No.252, Sec. 2, Jincheng Rd., Tucheng Dist. 236 New Taipei City / TW | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Becker Kurig Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12162374.8 | 30.03.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US201113106875 | 13.05.2011 Original published format: US201113106875 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523068 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G06F1/3228 (EP,US);
G06F1/3221 (EP,US);
G06F1/3268 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Energiesparverfahren und Vorrichtung dafür | [2012/46] | English: | Power saving method and apparatus thereof | [2012/46] | French: | Procédé d'économie d'énergie et appareil correspondant | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/02] | 04.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5799199 (ITO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [X]US2005120256 (LU DE-JEN [TW]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0026] *; | [X]US2009019301 (MINAMI AKIRA [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0055]; figures 3,5 * |