EP2474272 - Surgical stapling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Racenet, David 1390 Bartholomew Road Middletown, CT Connecticut 06457 / US | 02 /
Stearns, Ralph A. 38 South Road Bozrah, CT Connecticut 06334 / US | 03 /
Beardsley, John W. 14 Killen Road Wallingford, CT Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
Roy, Philip C. 521 Indian Peaks Trail West Lafayette, CO Colorado 80026 / US | 05 /
Olsen, Lee Ann 125 South Elm Wallingford, CT Connecticut 06492 / US | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2020/45] |
Former [2012/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163121.2 | 17.06.2004 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | US20030479379P | 17.06.2003 Original published format: US 479379 P | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2474272 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2474272 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2474272 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/068, A61B17/072, A61B17/29 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/068 (US);
A61B17/0644 (US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B34/71 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0688 (US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,US);
A61B2017/291 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2020/45] |
Former [2012/28] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | Title | German: | Chirurgische Klammervorrichtung | [2012/28] | English: | Surgical stapling device | [2012/28] | French: | Dispositif d'agrafage chirurgical | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 12.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 25.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04755712.9 / EP1635713 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.11.2020 | IT | 04.11.2020 | IE | 17.06.2021 | [2022/21] |
Former [2021/48] | ES | 04.11.2020 | |
IT | 04.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 04.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4580712 (GREEN DAVID T [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 52; figure - *; | [A]EP0648476 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1* column 32, line 51 - column 38, line 3; figures 52-65 *; | [X]EP0666057 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1 * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 34; figure - *; | [A]US2002138082 (BROCK DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0267]; figures 16A-16D *; | [XP]WO2004032763 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [XP] 1 * page 10, paragraph l - page 14, line 13; figure - * | Examination | EP0666057 | by applicant | US6241139 | US6250532 | US20020416088 | US20020416372 |