EP2508442 - Storage container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curver Luxembourg SARL ZI Haneboesch L4562 Neidercorn / LU | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duvigneau, Nikolai 8/20 Narkis Street P.O. Box 4181 30900 Zichron Yaacov / IL | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2012/41] | Application number, filing date | 12163137.8 | 04.04.2012 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | US201161471491P | 04.04.2011 Original published format: US 201161471491 P | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2508442 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2508442 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D51/16, B65D53/02, B65D81/26, B29C45/16, B29L31/56, B29C45/00, B65D21/02 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B65D43/0218 (EP,US);
B29C45/0081 (EP,US);
B29C45/1676 (EP,US);
B65D21/0217 (EP,US);
B65D21/0222 (EP,US);
B65D21/0233 (EP,US);
B65D43/0204 (EP,US);
B65D45/20 (EP,US);
B65D51/16 (EP,US);
B65D51/1644 (EP,US);
B65D53/02 (EP,US);
B65D81/262 (EP,US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US);
B65D2203/00 (EP,US);
B65D2203/04 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0012 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/0049 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00555 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00564 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/41] | B65D43/02, B65D51/16, B65D53/02, B65D81/26, B29C45/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lagerbehälter | [2012/41] | English: | Storage container | [2012/41] | French: | Récipient de stockage | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 24.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 27.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1547898 (STAMPLAST SOCIETA PER AZIONI) [A] 2 * page 2, column r, line 5 - line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4679699 (MALSBURY CHARLES R [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 6, line 1 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH08143070 (NAKAMURA KENJI) [A] 6,12,13* abstract *; | [Y]WO9808748 (RUBBERMAID INC [US]) [Y] 2,10,14 * page 5, paragraph 10 - page 10, line 8; figure - *; | [XY]EP1338399 (DEMAG ERGOTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,11,15 * column 2, paragraph 10 - column 4, paragraph 19; figure - * [Y] 2,7,10,14; | [A]US2007137500 (OK GIL S [KR], et al) [A] 6,12,13 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO2007148853 (JANG DOO JIN [KR]) [X] 1 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 40; figure - * [A] 2; | [X]US2011042382 (VAZZANO PEGGY LYNNE [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, paragraph 22 - page 2, paragraph 26; figure - *; | [E]KR20110030361 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [E] 1,6 * the whole document * |