EP2523307 - Systems and methods for use in correcting intermittent utility service outages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thoppay, Rajeshbabu KB 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339-8402 / US | 02 /
Tracey, James S. 1009 West Nasa Boulevard Melbourne, FL 32904 / US | 03 /
Souvannarath, Manyphay 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA 30339-8402 / US | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Picker, Madeline Margaret GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12163334.1 | 05.04.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US201113086102 | 13.04.2011 Original published format: US201113086102 | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2523307 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2523307 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
H02J13/00001 (EP,US);
H02J13/00006 (EP,US);
H02J13/00034 (EP,US);
H02J13/00012 (EP,US);
H02J13/00028 (EP,US);
Y02B90/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] |
Former [2012/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verwendung bei der Korrektur von intermittierenden Versorgungsdienstausfällen | [2012/46] | English: | Systems and methods for use in correcting intermittent utility service outages | [2012/46] | French: | Systèmes et procédés à utiliser dans la correction d'interruptions intermittentes de service d'électricité | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 26.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/43] | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5696695 (EHLERS GREGORY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,12,15 * abstract * * figure 2 * * column 30, line 29 - line 63 * * column 31, line 22 - line 43 * * column 10, line 14 - line 39 * * column 17, line 51 * [Y] 3,8,10,11,13,14; | [Y]US2002035497 (MAZEREEUW JEFF [CA], et al) [Y] 3,8,10,11,13,14 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] *; | [A]US2008183339 (VASWANI RAJ [US], et al) [A] 1,9,15* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * |