EP2647854 - Weight optimized connecting rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Metalúrgica Campo Limpo Ltda. Av. Alfried Krupp, 1050 13231-900 Campo Limpo Paulista-SP / BR | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fonseca Galli, Luis Antonio Rua Siqueira Campos, 199 Sousas - Campinas, SP 13.106-006 / BR | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Braun-Dullaeus, Karl-Ulrich Braun-Dullaeus Pannen Platz der Ideen 2 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163368.9 | 05.04.2012 | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647854 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16C7/02 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
F16C7/023 (EP,US);
F16J1/14 (US);
F16C2360/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gewichtsoptimiertes Pleuel | [2018/20] | English: | Weight optimized connecting rod | [2013/41] | French: | Bielle optimisée en poids | [2018/20] |
Former [2013/41] | Gewichtsoptimierte Verbindungsstange | ||
Former [2013/41] | Tige de connexion optimisée pour le poids | Examination procedure | 09.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 17.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1575383 (BEVERIDGE JOHN HERBERT) [A] 11 * figures 1,2 *; | [XYI]JPH07279942 (KIORITZ CORP) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 5,8,11; | [XI]US5617820 (BEARDMORE JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * column 2, line 34 - line 57; figure 1 * [I] 5,8,11; | [Y]DE10018064 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 5,6 *; | [XI]WO02075171 (SUNDRAM FASTENERS LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12 * page 10, line 7 - line 11; figure 2e * * page 12, line 10 - line 22 * [I] 5,8,11; | [A]DE10360742 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]CN201318383Y (SHANGHAI GENERAL MOTORS CO LTD [CN]) [A] 8,12 * abstract * | by applicant | WO8604122 | US5048368 | US2004000216 | WO2006135351 | US7810411 |