Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012265074 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110033913 | 12.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101478622B | Global Dossier | 02.01.2015 | B1 | KR20120116364 | 22.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20110033913 | 12.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2511878 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B1 | EP2511878 | 17.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110033913 | 12.04.2011 |