EP2508623 - DNA methylation markers and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 N. Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brock, Malcolm V. 1240 Berans Road Owings mills, MD 21117 / US | 02 /
Baylin, Stephen 1241 Riverside Avenue Baltimore, MD 21230 / US | 03 /
Herman, James G. 206 Dunbeath Ct. Lutherville MD 21093 / US | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2012/41] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163883.7 | 20.11.2007 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | US20060860196P | 20.11.2006 Original published format: US 860196 P | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2508623 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2508623 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2012/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DNA-Methylierungsmarker und Verwendungsverfahren | [2012/41] | English: | DNA methylation markers and methods of use | [2012/41] | French: | Marqueurs de méthylation de l'ADN et leurs méthodes d'utilisation | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07862181.0 / EP2102361 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070862181) is 12.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2007 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IE | 20.11.2015 | LU | 20.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 20.11.2007 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IE | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
LU | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005042713 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0244331 (CANGEN INTERNAT [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - LIU Y ET AL, "Hypermethylation of p16INK4a in chinese lung cancer patients : biological and clinical implications", CARCINOGENESIS, XX, XX, (20030101), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1897 - 1901, XP002305903 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - NAKATA SHOJI ET AL, "The methylation status and protein expression of CDH1, p16(INK4A), and fragile histidine triad in nonsmall cell lung carcinoma - Epigenetic silencing, clinical features, and prognostic significance", CANCER, (200605), vol. 106, no. 10, ISSN 0008-543X, pages 2190 - 2199, XP008155286 [X] 6-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cncr.21870 | [X] - HARDEN SUSAN V ET AL, "Gene promoter hypermethylation in tumors and lymph nodes of stage I lung cancer patients.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH APR 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12684406, (200304), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1370 - 1375, XP002682306 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | [Y] - ZOCHBAUER-MULLER S ET AL, "Aberrant promoter methylation of multiple genes in non-small cell lung cancers", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20010101), vol. 61, no. 1, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 249 - 255, XP002251520 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | [Y] - ESTELLER M ET AL, "Detection of aberrant promotor hypermethylation of tumor suppressor genes in serum DNA from non-small cell lung cancer patients", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (19990101), vol. 59, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 67 - 70, XP002959643 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | WO0218649 | - HOJOONG KIM ET AL, "Tumor-specific methylation in bronchial lavage for the early detection of non-small-cell lung cancer", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, US, (20040615), vol. 22, no. 12, doi:10.1200/JCO.2004.10.077, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 2363 - 2370, XP002641112 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2004.10.077 | - ZÖCHBAUER-MÜLLER SABINE ET AL, "Aberrant methylation of multiple genes in the upper aerodigestive tract epithelium of heavy smokers.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER. JOURNAL INTERNATIONAL DU CANCER 20 NOV 2003, (20031120), vol. 107, no. 4, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 612 - 616 | - KIM Y T ET AL, "Can Aberrant Promoter Hypermethylation of CpG Islands Predict the Clinical Outcome of Non-Small Cell Lung Cancer After Curative Resection?", THE ANNALS OF THORACIC SURGERY, ELSEVIER, UNITED STATES, vol. 79, no. 4, ISSN 0003-4975, (20050401), pages 1180 - 1188, (20050401), XP027732305 | - JIN S K ET AL, "Cohypermethylation of p16 and FHIT promoters as a prognostic factor of recurrence in surgically resected stage I non-small cell lung cancer", EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060415), Database accession no. EMB-2006208416 | - JIN S K ET AL, "Cohypermethylation of p16 and FHIT promoters as a prognostic factor of recurrence in surgically resected stage I non-small cell lung cancer", CANCER RESEARCH 20060415 US, (20060415), vol. 66, no. 8, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4049 - 4054 | by applicant | US2005239101 | US7214485 | US6017704 | US5786146 | US6200756 | US6265171 | US4458066 | US7144701 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4800159 | - BAYLIN ET AL., ADV. CANCER RES., (1998), vol. 72, pages 141 - 196 | - RINSHO, BYORI, Genpatsusei Kangan Toriatsukaikiyaku, NIHON KANGANGAKU KENKYUKAI, (1992), page 22 | - BIRD, A., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 209 | - LI ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 366, page 362 | - SAKAI ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1991), vol. 48, page 880 | - HERMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., U.S.A., (1994), vol. 91, page 9700 | - ISSA ET AL., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 7, page 536 | - MERLO ET AL., NATURE MED., (1995), vol. 1, page 686 | - HERMAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, page 722 | - GRAFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, page 5195 | - HERMAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, page 4525 | - FROMMER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, page 1827 | - CLARK ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, page 2990 | - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, pages L859 - 1862 | - KUHN HOFFINANN-BERLING, CSH-QUANTITATIVE BIOLOGY, (1978), vol. 43, page 63 | - C. RADDING, ANN. REV. GENETICS, (1982), vol. 16, pages 405 - 437 | - MANIATIS ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR, N.Y., (1982), page 280,281 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - HELLMAN S., "Stopping metastases at their source", N ENGL J MED, (1997), vol. 337, pages 996 - 7 | - RIETHMULLER G; JOHNSON JP, "Monoclonal antibodies in the detection and therapy of micrometastatic epithelial cancers", CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 4, pages 647 - 55 | - ZHU JJ; MARUYAMA T; JACOBY LB ET AL., "Clonal analysis of a case of multiple meningiomas using multiple molecular genetic approaches: pathology case report", NEUROSURGERY, (1999), vol. 45, pages 409 - 16 | - MARTINI N; BAINS MS; BURT ME ET AL., "Incidence of local recurrence and second primary tumors in resected stage I lung cancer", J THORAC CARDIOVASC SURG, (1995), vol. 109, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-5223(95)70427-2, pages 120 - 9, XP005143890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5223(95)70427-2 | - MOUNTAIN CF., "Revisions in the International System for Staging Lung Cancer", CHEST, (1997), vol. 111, pages 1710 - 7 | - HOFFINAN PC; MAUER AM; VOKES EE, "Lung cancer", LANCET, (2000), vol. 355, pages 479 - 85 | - HERMAN JG; BAYLIN SB, "Gene silencing in cancer in association with promoter hypermethylation", N ENGL J MED, (2003), vol. 349, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMra023075, pages 2042 - 54, XP008114714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMra023075 | - BAYLIN SB; OHM JE, "Epigenetic gene silencing in cancer - a mechanism for early oncogenic pathway addiction?", NAT REV CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, pages 107 - 16 | - HERMAN JG; GRAFF JR; MYOHANEN S; NELKIN BD; BAYLIN SB, "Methylation-specific PCR: a novel PCR assay for methylation status ofCpG islands", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1996), vol. 93, pages 9821 - 6, XP055092786 | - ESTELLER M; CORN PG; BAYLIN SB; HERMAN JG, "A gene hypermethylation profile of human cancer", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 3225 - 9 | - PELLISE M; CASTELLS A; GINES A ET AL., "Detection of lymph node micrometastases by gene promoter hypermethylation in samples obtained by endosonography- guided fine-needle aspiration biopsy", CLIN CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 10, pages 4444 - 9 | - SANCHEZ-CESPEDES M; ESTELLER M; HIBI K ET AL., "Molecular detection of neoplastic cells in lymph nodes of metastatic colorectal cancer patients predicts recurrence", CLIN CANCER RES, (1999), vol. 5, pages 2450 - 4, XP002977985 | - KOLLERMANN J; MULLER M; GOESSL C ET AL., "Methylation-specific PCR for DNA- based detection of occult tumor cells in lymph nodes of prostate cancer patients", EUR UROL, (2003), vol. 44, pages 533 - 8 | - HARDEN SV; TOKUMARU Y; WESTRA WH ET AL., "Gene promoter hypermethylation in tumors and lymph nodes of stage I lung cancer patients", CLIN CANCER. RES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 5 | - BELINSKY SA; NIKULA KJ; PALMISANO WA ET AL., "Aberrant methylation of p16(INIC4a) is an early event in lung cancer and a potential biomarker for early diagnosis", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1998), vol. 95, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.95.20.11891, pages 11891 - 6, XP002906659 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.20.11891 | - TOYOOKA KO; TOYOOKA S; VIRMANI AK ET AL., "Loss of expression and aberrant methylation of the CDH13 (H-cadherin) gene in breast and lung carcinomas", CANCER RES, (2001), vol. 61, pages 4556 - 60, XP055107860 | - TOYOOKA S; TOYOOKA KO; MARUYAMA R ET AL., "DNA methylation profiles of lung tumors", MOL CANCER THER, (2001), vol. 1, pages 61 - 7, XP002251519 | - MACHIDA EO; BROCK MV; HOOKER CM ET AL., "Hypermethylation of ASC/TMS 1 is a sputum marker for late-stage lung cancer", CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-4447, pages 6210 - 8, XP002502183 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-4447 | - BROCK MV; KIM MP; HOOKER CM ET AL., "Pulmonary resection in octogenarians with stage I nonsmall cell lung cancer: a 22-year experience", ANN THORAC SURG, (2004), vol. 77, pages 271 - 7 | - ETTINGER DS; COX JD; GINSBERG RJ ET AL., "NCCN Non-Small-Cell Lung Cancer Practice Guidelines. The National Comprehensive Cancer Network", ONCOLOGY (WILLISTON PARK, (1996), vol. 10, pages 81 - 111 | - JOHNSON BE, "NCCN: Small cell lung cancer", CANCER CONTROL, (2001), vol. 8, pages 32 - 43 | - GINSBERG RJ; RUBINSTEIN LV, "Randomized trial of lobectomy versus limited resection for T1 NO non-small cell lung cancer. Lung Cancer Study Group", ANN THORAC SURG, (1995), vol. 60, pages 615 - 22,622-3 | - HOUSE MG; GUO M; EFRON DT ET AL., "Tumor suppressor gene hypermethylation as a predictor of gastric stromal tumor behavior", J GASTROINTEST SURG, (2003), vol. 7, pages 1004 - 14 | - VAN ENGELAND M; WEIJENBERG MP; ROEMEN GM ET AL., "Effects of dietary folate and alcohol intake on promoter methylation in sporadic colorectal cancer: the Netherlands cohort study on diet and cancer", CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 63, pages 3133 - 7 | - GUO M; REN J; HOUSE MG; QI Y; BROCK MV; HERMAN JG, "Accumulation of promoter methylation suggests epigenetic progression in squamous cell carcinoma of the esophagus", CLIN CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 12, pages 4515 - 22 | - VAN ENGELAND M; ROEMEN GM; BRINK M ET AL., "K-ras mutations and RASSFIA promoter methylation in colorectal cancer", ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1038/SJ/ONC/1205466, pages 3792 - 5, XP008102911 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ/ONC/1205466 | - ESTELLER M; GARCIA-FONCILLAS J; ANDION E ET AL., "Inactivation of the DNA-repair gene MGMT and the clinical response of gliomas to alkylating agents", N ENGL J MED, (2000), vol. 343, pages 1350 - 4 | - BROCK MV; GOU M; AKIYAMA Y ET AL., "Prognostic importance of promoter hypermethylation of multiple genes in esophageal adenocarcinoma", CLIN CANCER RES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 2912 - 9 | - TANG X; KHURI FR; LEE JJ ET AL., "Hypermethylation of the death-associated protein (DAP) kinase promoter and aggressiveness in stage I non-small-cell lung cancer", J NATL CANCER INST, (2000), vol. 92, doi:doi:10.1093/jnci/92.18.1511, pages 1511 - 6, XP002959642 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/92.18.1511 | - POTTI A; MUKHERJEE S; PETERSEN R ET AL., "A genomic strategy to refine prognosis in early-stage non-small-cell lung cancer", N ENGL J MED, (2006), vol. 355, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa060467, pages 570 - 80, XP009096340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa060467 | - BRUNDAGE MD; DAVIES D; MACKILLOP WJ, "Prognostic factors in non-small cell lung cancer: a decade of progress", CHEST, (2002), vol. 122, pages 1037 - 57 | - CHEN HY; YU SL; CHEN CH ET AL., "A five-gene signature and clinical outcome in non-small-cell lung cancer", N ENGL J MED, (2007), vol. 356, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa060096, pages 11 - 20, XP009086044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa060096 | - GU J; BERMAN D; LU C ET AL., "Aberrant promoter methylation profile and association with survival in patients with non-small cell lung cancer", CLIN CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 12, pages 7329 - 38 | - BELINSKY SA; LIECHTY KC; GENTRY FD, "Promoter hypermethylation of multiple genes in sputum precedes lung cancer incidence in a high-risk cohort", CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, pages 3338 - 44 | - GORE SD; BAYLIN S; SUGAR E ET AL., "Combined DNA methyltransferase and histone deacetylase inhibition in the treatment of myeloid neoplasms", CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-0080, pages 6361 - 9, XP002477180 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-0080 | - FEARON, CELL, (1990), vol. 61, page 759 | - JONES ET AL., CANCER RES., (1986), vol. 46, page 461 | - BAYLIN ET AL., CANCER CELLS, (1991), vol. 3, page 383 | - SAIKI ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, pages 1008 - 1012 | - CONNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1983), vol. 80, page 278 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 229 - 237 | - MANSOUR ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 320, pages 485 - 490 |