EP2489472 - Method of making a backingless abrasive article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. 1 New Bond Street Box No. 15138 Worcester, MA 01615-0138 / US | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIFS Rue de L'Ambassadeur 78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | [2012/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sankaranarayanan, Ramaswamy 43/20, Apt Nr.3 Fifth Trust Cross Street Mandavellipakkam Chennai 600 028 / IN | 02 /
Montuori, Daniel S. 692 Pearse Road Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Moll, Leland E. 174 Burgoyne Road Schuylerville, NY New York 12871 / US | [2012/39] |
Former [2012/34] | 01 /
Sankaranarayanan, Ramaswamy 10 Post Oak Lane, 2 Natick, MA Massachusetts 01760 / US | ||
02 /
Montuori, Daniel S. 692 Pearse Road Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | |||
03 /
Moll, Leland E. 174 Burgoyne Road Schuylerville, NY New York 12871 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12163916.5 | 13.07.2007 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | US20060831165P | 14.07.2006 Original published format: US 831165 P | [2012/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2489472 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2489472 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/00, B24D3/20, B24D11/00, B24D18/00 | [2012/37] | CPC: |
B24D3/002 (EP,US);
B24D3/00 (KR);
B24D3/22 (US);
B24D11/00 (KR);
B24D11/001 (EP,US);
B24D18/00 (EP,US);
B24D3/20 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Schleifartikels ohne Träger | [2012/34] | English: | Method of making a backingless abrasive article | [2012/34] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un article abrasif dépourvu de renforcement | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07796872.5 / EP2079559 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070796872) is 13.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5958794 (BRUXVOORT WESLEY J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 15, lines 11-17 * * column 17, lines 29-32 * * column 23, lines 20-39 * * column 38, lines 15-17; figure 17 *; | [A]EP1470892 (JSR CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022] , [0073] , [0081] , [0121]; figures 19,22,23 * | by applicant | US5126394 |