EP2484404 - Method of making a kink-resistant access sheath [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/32] | Kink-resistant access sheath and method of making same | ||
[2015/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22872 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | [2015/42] |
Former [2012/32] | For all designated states APPLIED MEDICAL RESOURCES CORPORATION 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA 92688 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brustad, John R c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 02 /
Adlparvar, Payam c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 03 /
Aliahmad, Wassim R c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 04 /
Tran, Canh T c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 05 /
Hilal, Nabil c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 06 /
Pravong, Boun c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 07 /
Pinedjian, Raffi S c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | 08 /
Hart, Charles C c/o Applied Medical Resources Corporation 22782 Avenida Empresa Rancho Santa Margarita, CA California 92688 / US | [2012/32] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12164364.7 | 12.11.2003 | [2012/32] | Priority number, date | US20020298116 | 15.11.2002 Original published format: US 298116 | [2012/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2484404 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2484404 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61M25/06 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
A61M25/0012 (EP,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,US);
A61M25/0662 (EP,US);
B29C48/0011 (EP,US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,US);
B29C48/154 (EP,US);
B29C48/156 (EP,US);
B29C53/60 (EP,US);
A61B17/3415 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2012/32] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für knickfeste Zugriffshülle | [2015/27] | English: | Method of making a kink-resistant access sheath | [2015/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication pour gaine d'accès résistante au coudage | [2015/27] |
Former [2012/32] | Knickfeste Zugriffshülle und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2012/32] | Kink-resistant access sheath and method of making same | ||
Former [2012/32] | Gaine d'accès résistante au coudage et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 17.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/32] | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03796398.0 / EP1567208 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030796398) is 27.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0166176 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,11,12,14 * page 5, line 9 - page 9, line 28 *[I] 5,6,8-10,13,15 | Examination | US5131380 | by applicant | US5380304 | US2002038115 |