EP2520848 - Valve device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2020/21] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Numazaki, Kazushi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Imoto, Yoshinori c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Inada, Yutaka c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Hiroaki c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2020/21] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
Numazaki, Kazushi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Imoto, Yoshinori c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
03 /
Inada, Yutaka c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | |||
04 /
Suzuki, Hiroaki c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 12164896.8 | 20.04.2012 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | JP20110098242 | 26.04.2011 Original published format: JP 2011098242 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2520848 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2520848 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2520848 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/04 | [2019/49] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP,US);
F16K1/00 (EP,US);
F16K31/00 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0335 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0385 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/38] | F17C13/04, F16K31/00, F16K31/06, F16K1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/45] | F17C13/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | Ventilvorrichtung | [2012/45] | English: | Valve device | [2012/45] | French: | Dispositif à vanne | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/14] | 19.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2019 | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2012 | AL | 20.05.2020 | AT | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | ES | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | IT | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | PL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MK | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 20.04.2012 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
PL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
AT | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
ES | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56132779 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [YA]US5458151 (WASS LLOYD G [US]) [Y] 3-5 * figures 2, 5A * * column 2, lines 2-4, 55-67 * * column 3, lines 36-38 * * column 4, lines 8-9, 18-28 * [A] 1,2; | [XY]US2002104673 (MILLER GARY WAYNE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 3-5 | by applicant | US2003151018 |