EP2675106 - Industrial automation and control device user access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarez, Fernando Niederwiesstr. 13a 5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | 02 /
Hohlbaum, Frank Gartenstrasse 77 79713 Bad Säckingen / DE | 03 /
Meuli, Martin Vogelhalde 24 8532 Warth / CH | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 12165200.2 | 23.04.2012 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675106 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/30 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
H04L9/3268 (US);
G06F21/41 (US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L9/083 (EP,US);
H04L9/088 (EP,US);
H04L9/3226 (US);
H04L9/3271 (US);
G06F2221/2115 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Benutzerzugang für industrielle Automatisierungs- und Steuervorrichtung | [2013/51] | English: | Industrial automation and control device user access | [2013/51] | French: | Accès utilisateur à un dispositif de commande et d'automatisation industrielle | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008098466 (YOSHIDA TAKEO [JP], et al) [I] 1-10* the whole document *; | [I] - JOHN CLARK ET AL, "A Survey of Authentication protocol Literature: Version 1.0", INTERNET CITATION, (19971117), pages 1 - 109, URL: http://www-users.cs.york.ac.uk/~jac/papers/drareviewps.ps, (20100122), XP002565102 [I] 1-10 * paragraph [6.3.5] * | [Y] - MENEZES A ET AL, "Handbook of Applied Cryptography, KEY MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES", HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY, XX, XX, (19960101), pages 543 - 590, XP002246921 [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [13.2] - paragraph [13.3] * | [Y] - MENEZES A J ET AL, Handbook of Applied Cryptography, key establishment protocols, HANDBOOK OF APPLIED CRYPTOGRAPHY; [CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICES AND ITS APPLICATIONS], CRC PRESS SERIES ON DISCRETE MATHEMATICS AND ITS APPLICATIONS, BOCA RATON, FL, US, PAGE(S) 489 - 508, (19970101), ISBN 978-0-8493-8523-0, XP002283799 [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [12.3.2] - paragraph [12.3.4] * |