EP2522636 - REGENERATIVE CHAMBER FOR A GLASS MELT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/46] | Regenerative chamber for a glass melt assembly | ||
[2016/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beteiligungen Sorg GmbH & Co. KG Stoltestrasse 23 97816 Lohr am Main / DE | [2012/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sorg, Alexander Schloßberg 4a 63739 Aschaffenburg / DE | 02 /
Lindig, Matthias Oberer Schenkgarten 8 55218 Ingelheim / DE | [2012/46] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/16] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2012/46] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12165649.0 | 26.04.2012 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | DE20111075619 | 10.05.2011 Original published format: DE102011075619 | [2012/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522636 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522636 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2522636 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/237, F27B3/26, F23L15/02, F28D17/02, F28F27/02 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
C03B5/237 (EP,US);
F23L15/02 (EP,US);
F28D17/02 (EP,US);
F28F27/02 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
Y02P40/50 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | C03B5/237, F27B3/26, F23L15/02, F28D17/02 | ||
Former IPC [2012/46] | C03B5/237 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2012/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REGENERATIVKAMMER FÜR EINE GLASSCHMELZANLAGE | [2016/51] | English: | REGENERATIVE CHAMBER FOR A GLASS MELT ASSEMBLY | [2016/51] | French: | CHAMBRE DE RÉGÉNÉRATEUR POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE VITRIFICATION | [2016/51] |
Former [2012/46] | Regenerativkammer für eine Glasschmelzanlage | ||
Former [2012/46] | Regenerative chamber for a glass melt assembly | ||
Former [2012/46] | Chambre de régénérateur pour une installation de vitrification | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2012 | AL | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | DK | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | MT | 12.04.2017 | NL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SE | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | IE | 26.04.2017 | LU | 26.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.04.2012 | |
DK | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
IE | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
LU | 26.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SE | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NL | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 12.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4088180 (TSAI YIH-WAN) [X] 1 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 12; figures 4, 7 * [A] 3,6-14 [I] 2,4,5; | [A]US4540361 (GAGNE ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4256173 (TSAI YIH-WAN, et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]US4257476 (TSAI YIH-WAN) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]GB711554 (DIDIER KOGAG HINSELMANN KOKSOFENBAU GASVERWERTUNG AG) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB510056 (BLAW KNOX CO) [A] 1-14 * page 2, lines 10-18; figure 6 * * page 4, lines 114-130 *; | [A]SU1020709 ; | [A]US1836412 (WILLIBALD TRINKS) [A] 1-4 * figure 1; claim 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1984, no. 46, Database accession no. 1984-286797, XP002693645 & SU1020709 A1 19830530 (FERROUS METALLURGY INST) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | Examination | DE19543743 |