EP2518273 - Axial compressor with arrangement for bleeding air from variable stator vane stages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moniz, Thomas Ory One Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | 02 /
Viars, Thomas One Neumann Way Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45215 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Williams, Andrew Richard Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12165786.0 | 26.04.2012 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US201113094934 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: US201113094934 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2518273 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2518273 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/06, F01D17/16, F02C9/18, F01D17/10, F04D27/02, F02C6/08, F04D29/54, F04D29/56 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
F02C9/18 (EP,US);
F01D17/105 (EP,US);
F02C6/08 (EP,US);
F04D27/0246 (EP,US);
F04D29/545 (EP,US);
F04D29/563 (EP,US);
F04D27/023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | F01D9/06, F01D17/16, F02C9/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Axialkompressor mit Anordnung zum Entlüften von Luft aus variablen Statorschaufelstufen | [2012/44] | English: | Axial compressor with arrangement for bleeding air from variable stator vane stages | [2012/44] | French: | Compresseur axial avec disposition de purge d'air provenant des étages d'aubes de stator variables | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 30.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP2055961 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0015]; figures 2,3 * [A] 8-11; | [Y]FR2601074 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1-7 * page 5, lines 15-38; figure 1 * * page 6 * * page 7, lines 1-13 *; | [A]US3945759 (BOBO MELVIN) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 7-42; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004033133 (MUNY RICHARD MARTIN [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018]; figures 1,2 * |