Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
01.07.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.06.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.11.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |